WV SB400 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing amount of sales tax proceeds dedicated to School Major Improvement Fund
Title
Reducing amount of sales tax proceeds dedicated to School Major Improvement Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 415) (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 136) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 136) (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 233, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/15/16 |
2016-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/16 |
2016-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/14/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 415) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-04 | House | Do pass |
2016-02-19 | House | To House Finance |
2016-02-22 | House | To Finance |
2016-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 136) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/17/16 |
2016-02-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2016-01-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB463 (Similar To) 2016-02-02 - To Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 15 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |