WV SB398 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - To House Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-21 - To House Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for making consumer loans
Title
Relating to requirements for making consumer loans
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate reconsidered and passed bill (Roll No. 151) (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 148) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 148) (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Senate reconsidered and passed bill (Roll No. 151) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Recalled from House |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 148) |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 2/16/18 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46A | 4 | 101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
46A | 4 | 107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |