WV SB331 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to allow counties to save excess funds.
Title
Eliminating cap on maximum amount of money in county's financial stabilization fund
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Amy Nichole Grady [R] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] |
Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 347) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 347) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 427) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 426) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 91) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 91) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 347) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 427) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 426) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 91) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 91) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 226, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/24 |
2024-03-07 | House | To Governor 3/6/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-06 | Senate | To Governor 3/6/2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 347) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 347) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 427) |
2024-03-01 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 426) |
2024-03-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-01 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-27 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-02-27 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-02-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-26 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-23 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-02-21 | House | To House Finance |
2024-02-21 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2024-02-06 | House | To House Political Subdivisions |
2024-02-06 | House | To Political Subdivisions then Finance |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 91) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 91) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-12 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-11 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4991 (Similar To) 2024-01-22 - To House Political Subdivisions
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 21 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
7 | 6 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |