WV SB303 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - To Education
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a five percent pay increase to all public school teachers.
Title
Providing salary increase for teachers
Sponsors
Sen. John Unger [D] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Del. Samuel Cann [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Education |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-08 | Senate | To Education then Finance |
2014-01-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2746 (Similar To) 2014-01-09 - To House Education
SB276 (Similar To) 2014-01-08 - To Education
HB4144 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - To House Finance
SB391 (Similar To) 2014-04-14 - Chapter 158, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
SB276 (Similar To) 2014-01-08 - To Education
HB4144 (Similar To) 2014-01-14 - To House Finance
SB391 (Similar To) 2014-04-14 - Chapter 158, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18A | 4 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |