WV SB259 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Expanding Coyote Control Program
Title
Expanding Coyote Control Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 147) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2019-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2019-02-19 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Finance |
2019-02-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 147) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Finance |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-11 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance |
2019-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB75 (Similar To) 2019-01-09 - To Agriculture and Rural Development
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
7 | 7 | 6e | Amended Code | Citation Text |