WV SB222 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to amend the West Virginia Municipal Police Officers and Firefighters Retirement System (the "Plan") to ensure the plan's continued qualified status under federal tax law by making an amendment necessary to comply with Section 824 of the Pension Protection Act of 2006 (P.L. 109-280) ("PPA"). Section 824 of the PPA requires that the Plan permit eligible rollover distributions to a Roth IRA described in Section 408A of the Internal Revenue Code. This bill amends the direct rollover provision of the plan by adding Roth IRAs to the definition of "eligible retirement plan" and amending the definition of "eligible rollover distribution" to provide that distributions of after-tax amounts may be rolled over to a Roth IRA. Srike-throughs indicate language that would be stricken from present law, and underscoring indicates new language that would be added.
Title
Relating to Municipal Police Officers and Firefighters Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Foster [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - House - Passage (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 126, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/11 | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/23/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/11 | |
2011-03-11 | House Message received | |
2011-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-10 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Passed House (Roll No. 284) | |
2011-03-10 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-10 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-09 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-08 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-08 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | To House Finance | |
2011-02-23 | Do pass, but first to Finance | |
2011-02-15 | To House Pensions and Retirement | |
2011-02-15 | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-14 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-14 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2011-02-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-14 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-11 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-10 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-09 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-01 | To Government Organization | |
2011-02-01 | Reported do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2011-01-20 | To Pensions | |
2011-01-20 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-01-20 | To Pensions then Government Organization | |
2011-01-20 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2764 (Same As) 2011-01-24 - To House Pensions and Retirement
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22A | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |