WV SB17 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Department of Health to promulgate a legislative rule relating to public water systems operators.This section is new; therefore,
Title
Authorizing Department of Health to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 739) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 738) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 458) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 458) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 462) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Motion to postpone action one day adopted (Roll No. 172) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-09 - House - House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 738) (Y: 90 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 458) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 458) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 462) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Motion to postpone action one day adopted (Roll No. 172) (Y: 80 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/24 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/14/2024 - House Journal |
2024-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 - Senate Journal |
2024-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/14/2024 |
2024-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2024-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 739) |
2024-03-09 | House | House receded in part and passed (Roll No. 738) |
2024-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 458) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 458) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Senate concur in part; refuse concur in part; request House recede |
2024-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2024-03-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 463) |
2024-03-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 462) |
2024-03-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2024-03-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Committee amendment withdrawn (Voice) |
2024-03-04 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2024-03-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2024-03-04 | House | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/14/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Motion to postpone action one day adopted (Roll No. 172) |
2024-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2024-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2024-02-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2024-01-24 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced in House |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 43) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 43) |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2024-01-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2024-01-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2024-01-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2024-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2024-01-10 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4042 (Similar To) 2024-01-10 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 5 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |