WV SB160 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-11 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update and correct sections of the West Virginia Rail Trails Program. The bill provides for updated definitions to include a definition of "rail with trail." Finally, the bill addresses railroad liability and safety risk concerns proposed during the 2021 regular legislative session.
Title
WV Rail Trails Program
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] | Sen. Michael Maroney [R] |
Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Vince Deeds [R] | Sen. Jay Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-02 | House | From Housel Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2023-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-21 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2023-02-01 | House | To House Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-02-01 | House | To Economic Development and Tourism |
2023-02-01 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 100) |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-01-31 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-01-30 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-01-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2023-01-12 | Senate | To Outdoor Recreation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-12 | Senate | To Outdoor Recreation |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5B | 1A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5B | 1A | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |