WV SB131 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB131

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Tim Tebow Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Tim Tebow Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - Senate - Effective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 105) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 105) (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseTo House Education
2020-02-12HouseTo Education
2020-02-12HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-11SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-11SenateEffective July 1, 2020 (Roll No. 105)
2020-02-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 105)
2020-02-11SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-10SenateBaldwin Floor amendment #2 rejected (Voice vote)
2020-02-10SenateBaldwin Floor amendments #1 rejected (Voice vote)
2020-02-10SenateBaldwin Floor amendment #3 rejected (Voice vote)
2020-02-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-07SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/7/20
2020-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-05SenateCommittee substitute reported
2020-01-08SenateTo Education
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-08SenateTo Education
2020-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB131 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
18225cNew CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback