WV HCR28 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-13 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-13 - Completed legislative action
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The "Dedicated to the Pound Punchers, Melissa Ferrell, Founder, Highway"
Title
The "Mud River Pound Punchers Highway"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Adopted by Senate (Voice vote) |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-13 | Senate | Reported be adopted |
2013-03-18 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-18 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-15 | House | Adopted by House, Special Calendar (Voice vote) |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported by the Clerk |
2013-03-15 | House | From House Calendar, Unf. Business, to Special Calendar |
2013-03-14 | House | By substitute, be adopted |
2013-02-15 | House | To House Rules |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-15 | House | To Rules |
2013-02-15 | House | Filed for introduction |