WV HB4670 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the juvenile restorative justice programs
Title
Relating to the juvenile restorative justice programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 209) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-17 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 209) |
2020-02-17 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-17 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-14 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2020-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-13 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-12 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | To House Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-02-04 | House | To Judiciary |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 725 | Amended Code | Citation Text |