WV HB4525 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to change the composition of the Board of Coal Mine Health and Safety.
Title
Changing the composition, powers and responsibilities of the board of Coal Mine Health and Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 131, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - House Journal | |
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 4/1/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-31 | To Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 406) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-12 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 44) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 43) | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-12 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Committee amendment withdrawn by unanimous consent | |
2010-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Having been read 1st time, prior proceedings, 3/11/10 | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment | |
2010-03-11 | On 2nd reading to Government Organization | |
2010-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Government Organization | |
2010-03-04 | To Energy, Industry and Mining | |
2010-03-04 | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Government Organization | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed House (Roll No. 147) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-02-26 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-17 | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB591 (Same As) 2010-02-17 - To Energy, Industry and Mining
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22A | 1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2A | 301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2A | 304 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 2A | 310 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 7 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22A | 7 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=4525&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |