WV HB4396 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing federal adjusted gross income relating to tolls for travel on West Virginia toll roads paid electronically
Title
Reducing federal adjusted gross income relating to tolls for travel on West Virginia toll roads paid electronically
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 395) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 139) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 139) (Y: 75 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 55, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 395) |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-03-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-16 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 139) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-15 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-14 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-10 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-26 | House | To House Finance |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-26 | House | To Finance |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB474 (Similar To) 2022-01-24 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 12h | Repealed Code | Citation Text |