WV HB4233 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-16 - Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill concerns generally fraudulent transfers. The bill establishes that a presumption imposes on the party against which the presumption is directed the burden of proving that the nonexistence of insolvency is more probable than its existence. The bill provides that a creditor making a claim for relief has the burden of proving the elements of the claim for relief by a preponderance of the evidence. The bill sets forth rules regarding the defenses, liability and protection of transferees. The bill establishes the governing law. The bill provides for the application to series organizations. The bill provides for the limiting, modifying or superseding of the federal Electronic Signatures in Global and National Commerce Act. The bill adds new and modifies existing definitions.
Title
Relating generally to fraudulent transfers
Sponsors
Del. Erikka Storch [R] | Del. Danny Hamrick [R] | Del. Michael Ferro [D] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] |
Del. Joe Ellington [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 35) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 35) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Chapter 245, Acts, Regular Session, 2018 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-27 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Approved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-21 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 540) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 432) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Committee amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend, amendment pending |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendments and title amendment |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Having been read 1st time 3/7/18 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Judiciary on 2nd reading |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Without recommendation, but first rereferred to Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-02-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 35) |
2018-02-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-01 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-01-31 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-01-30 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2018-01-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-01-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2018-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 1A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 1A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 1A | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 1A | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 1A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 1A | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 1A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 1A | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 1A | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |