WV HB4159 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Updating the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms
Title
Updating the meaning of federal adjusted gross income and certain other terms
Sponsors
Del. Tim Miley [D] | Del. Tim Armstead [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 68) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 68) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | House | Chapter 173, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-20 | House | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/20/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-17 | House | To Governor 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-05 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 8) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-04 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-17 | Senate | To Finance |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-02-17 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-02-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-02-14 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 68) |
2014-02-14 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-14 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-13 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-12 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-02-12 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-02-11 | House | Do pass |
2014-01-14 | House | To House Finance |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-01-14 | House | To Finance |
2014-01-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB333 (Same As) 2014-01-10 - To Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 21 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |