WV HB4067 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To make certain agency reports electronic or eliminating certain agency reports altogether
Title
To make certain agency reports electronic or eliminating certain agency reports altogether
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 93) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 89) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 71) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 71) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 93) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 89) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 71) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 71) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-01-21 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 26) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 140, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-23 | House | Approved by Governor 2/23/22 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-17 | House | To Governor 2/17/22 |
2022-02-18 | House | To Governor 2/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-15 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 93) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 93) |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 90) |
2022-02-09 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amend with amend, passed bill (Roll No. 89) |
2022-02-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 71) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 71) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2022-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-24 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-21 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-21 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 27) |
2022-01-21 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-01-21 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 26) |
2022-01-21 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-21 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-20 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-19 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-19 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-18 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 7 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
14 | 2A | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 33 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 3B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 41 | 6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
18 | 10L | 7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 11 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
22A | 6 | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
29 | 6 | 7a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
31 | 15A | 17b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
31 | 18 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 25A | 35 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11B | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5A | 6C | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
8 | 13C | 13 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
9 | 4A | 2b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
9 | 4C | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |