WV HB4062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the residency requirement for the Commissioner of the Division of Highways
Title
Removing the residency requirement for the Commissioner of the Division of Highways
Sponsors
Del. Vernon Criss [R] | Del. Josh Booth [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 96) (Y: 94 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 85) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 85) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 38) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Chapter 139, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/21/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-21 | House | Approved by Governor 2/21/22 |
2022-02-15 | House | To Governor 2/15/22 |
2022-02-16 | House | To Governor 2/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-15 | Senate | To Governor 2/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 96) |
2022-02-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 85) |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-26 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 38) |
2022-01-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-25 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-21 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-21 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-20 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2022-01-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 2A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |