WV HB3232 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-06 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to direct the West Virginia State Lottery Commission to accredit Independent Evaluators to audit and opine on the Sports Betting Content directly or indirectly affiliated with mobile sports wagering licensees and report findings to the state of Maryland gaming control board. The purpose is consumer protection through setting standards and guidelines to combat predatory promotions/advertisement, remove industry bad actors, and create generally accepted evaluation practices. Creating the guardrails now, stabilizes the industry's growth and prevents collapses seen in other more mature markets and other industries (i.e. cryptocurrency). The goal is not to restrict business in any way, it is to elevate the industry and protect the consumer.
Title
Regulation of Sports Wagering
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 297) (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-03-06 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-02-27 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 297) |
2023-02-27 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-27 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-02-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-23 | House | Postponed on 1st reading, Special Calendar, until 2/24 |
2023-02-23 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2023-02-22 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2023-02-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-02-02 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22D | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 22D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |