WV HB3152 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to establish a registration process for certified athletic trainers.
Title
Athletic Trainers Registration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Ashley [R] | Del. Thomas Campbell [D] | Sen. Michael Caputo [D] | Del. Steven Kominar [D] |
Del. Harry White [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 11, Acts, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-31 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/31/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/30/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-30 | To Governor 3/30/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/30/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 326) | |
2010-03-13 | House received Senate message | |
2010-03-12 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-12 | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 22) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-12 | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 21) | |
2010-03-12 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-12 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-12 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-03-11 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-11 | On 1st reading | |
2010-03-11 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-11 | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment | |
2010-03-04 | To Government Organization | |
2010-03-04 | To Government Organization | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | Passed House (Roll No. 149) | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-03-03 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-02 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-01 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-01 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-02-26 | By substitute, do pass | |
2010-02-17 | To House Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | To House Government Organization | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced in House | |
2010-01-13 | To Government Organization then Judiciary | |
2010-01-13 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 20A | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20A | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 30 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 30 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 30 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=3152&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |