WV HB3072 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide a tax credit to coal producers who sell coal to taxpayers who increase their consumption of West Virginia coal in this state for the purpose of increasing coal production and coal related employment in West Virginia. This article is new, therefore, it has been completely underscored.
Title
West Virginia coal employment enhancement act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported do pass with amend and title amend but first to Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2013-04-04 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-04 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-03 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-03 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 193) |
2013-04-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-03 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-01 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-27 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-27 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business |
2013-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-22 | House | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Finance |
2013-03-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 13DD | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 13DD | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |