WV HB2966 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - To Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to employment and privacy protection
Title
Relating to employment and privacy protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 114) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-02 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 114) |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-28 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-27 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-03-19 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-19 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 5G | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 5G | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 5G | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |