WV HB2954 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - On 2nd reading to Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to require that members of the Mine Safety Technology Task Force are paid the same compensation as members of the Legislature are paid for each day or portion thereof engaged in the discharge of their interim duties.
Title
Requiring that members of the Mine Safety Technology Task Force are paid the same compensation as members of the Legislature
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 131) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 131) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Finance |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-04-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2013-04-03 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Finance |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-02 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-02 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 132) |
2013-04-02 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 131) |
2013-04-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-02 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-01 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-29 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-28 | House | Do pass |
2013-03-27 | House | To House Finance |
2013-03-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business |
2013-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-03-18 | House | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22A | 11 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |