WV HB2905 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to repealing the prohibition against the use of certain words
Title
Relating to repealing the prohibition against the use of certain words
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 273) (Y: 84 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 102) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 102) (Y: 76 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Chapter 57, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Approved by Governor 4/5/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-05 | House | Approved by Governor 4/5/21 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/5/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-30 | House | To Governor 3/30/21 |
2021-03-31 | House | To Governor 3/30/21 - House Journal |
2021-03-31 | Senate | To Governor 3/30/21 - Senate Journal |
2021-03-26 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-25 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-25 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 273) |
2021-03-25 | House | House concurred in Senate title amendment |
2021-03-24 | House | House received Senate message |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 178) |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-23 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 102) |
2021-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-05 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-04 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-04 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Originating in House Health and Human Resources |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 10 | 21 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |