WV HB2871 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2871
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to eliminate the mandatory 80% of employer, 20% employee cost share on PEIA active employee premiums and to instead set 80% as the maximum employer share and 20% as the minimum employee share.
Title
Eliminating the mandated employer versus employee cost share of eighty percent employer, twenty percent employee for Public Employee Insurance Agency
Sponsors
Del. Ron Walters [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Del. Marty Gearheart [R] | Del. Eric Householder [R] |
Del. John Overington [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-08 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-24 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-23 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2017-03-17 | House | To House Finance |
2017-03-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | To House Banking and Insurance |
2017-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-09 | House | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2017-03-09 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2871 (Carry Over) 2017-04-08 - On 2nd reading, House Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 16 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |