WV HB2613 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-28 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Governor's Committee on Crime, Delinquency and Correction to promulgate a legislative rule relating to the Protocol for Law Enforcement Response to Domestic Violence. This section is new; therefore, strike-throughs and underscoring have been omitted.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Military Affairs and Public Safety to promulgate legislative rules
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-18 - House - Effect From Passage (Y: 80 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-18 - House - Passage (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-18 - House - Passage (Y: 78 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-04 | Chapter 111, Acts, 2011 | |
2011-03-10 | Approved by Governor 3/9/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-09 | Approved by Governor 3/9/11 | |
2011-03-10 | Approved by Governor 3/9/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-04 | To Governor 3/3/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-03 | To Governor 3/3/11 | |
2011-03-04 | To Governor 3/3/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-01 | House received Senate message | |
2011-02-28 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-02-28 | Communicated to House | |
2011-02-28 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 23) | |
2011-02-28 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 23) | |
2011-02-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-28 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-25 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-25 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-24 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-24 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-23 | Reported do pass | |
2011-02-21 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-21 | House Message received | |
2011-02-18 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-02-18 | Effective from passage (Roll No. 112) | |
2011-02-18 | Passed House (Roll No. 111) | |
2011-02-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-18 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-17 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/18/11 | |
2011-02-17 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-16 | Laid over on 3rd reading, Special Calendar, until 2/17/11 | |
2011-02-16 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-15 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-02-14 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-14 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-02-11 | By substitute, do pass | |
2011-01-19 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in House | |
2011-01-19 | To Judiciary | |
2011-01-19 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
64 | 6 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |