WV HB2583 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is permit a pharmacist to dispense a self-administered hormonal contraceptive under a standing prescription drug order.
Title
Family Planning Access Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-09 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 699) (Y: 90 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 475) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 119) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 475) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 119) (Y: 87 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Chapter 215, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-25 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 699) |
2019-03-09 | House | House received Senate message |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 475) |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee amendment as amended adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rucker Amendments to committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Amendment Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 119) |
2019-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-06 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2019-01-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-01-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2019-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 56 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 56 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |