WV HB2579 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Vetoed by Governor 3/27/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to clarify conflicts within the code and create uniformity relating to the collection of taxes, the priority of distribution of an estate and to limit the liability of a fiduciary charged with distribution of the estate.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the collection of tax and the priority of distribution of an estate or property in receivership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 397) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 187) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateVetoed by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-21HouseTo Governor 3/21/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/21/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/21/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-07HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-07SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-07SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-07SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 397)
2019-03-07SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-07SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2019-03-06SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-03-05SenateRead 1st time
2019-03-05SenateOn 1st reading
2019-03-04SenateReported do pass
2019-03-01SenateTo Finance
2019-03-01SenateReported do pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-18SenateTo Judiciary
2019-02-18SenateTo Judiciary then Finance
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-02-18SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-15HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-15HousePassed House (Roll No. 187)
2019-02-15HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-15HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-14HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-14HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-13HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-13HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-12HouseBy substitute, do pass
2019-01-22HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced in House
2019-01-22HouseTo Judiciary
2019-01-22HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB406 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
111011Amended CodeCitation Text
111518aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback