WV HB2579 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 205, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 205, Acts, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to protect state waters by creating an implementation plan to establish state specific selenium criteria.
Title
Revising state water quality standard for Selenium
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-13 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 408) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 17) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Chapter 205, Acts, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-29 | House | To Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-13 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-13 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 408) |
2013-04-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 20) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-04-10 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2013-03-11 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 17) |
2013-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2013-03-05 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB472 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - To Energy, Industry and Mining
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 11 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |