WV HB2237 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-27 - To Health and Human Resources
Pending: Senate Health and Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring physicians and other licensed prescribers offer the drug Naloxone to their patients who are prescribed opiates for chronic pain
Title
Requiring physicians and other licensed prescribers offer the drug Naloxone to their patients who are prescribed opiates for chronic pain
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 70) (Y: 95 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2013-03-27 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-03-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 70) |
2013-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-03-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-03-22 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-03-22 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-03-21 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2013-02-21 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-02-21 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2013-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-02-13 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 5X | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5X | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 5X | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |