WV HB2148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to prohibit the consumption of an alcoholic beverage as well as the possession of an open alcoholic beverage container in a motor vehicle.
Title
Conforming the motor vehicle law of this state to the requirements of section 1405(a) of the federal Transportation Equity Act for the Twenty-first Century
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 334) (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Chapter 174, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/25/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/18/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/18/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-13 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-03-05 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 334) |
2015-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-02 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-02-28 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2015-02-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | House | Do pass with title amendment, but first to Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | To House Roads and Transportation |
2015-01-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-01-20 | House | To Roads and Transportation then Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17C | 5D | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17C | 5D | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 6 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |