WV HB105 | 2016 | 1st Special Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - To Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to end discretionary transfers to the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund, close the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund and transfer that fund’s balance to the General Revenue Fund of the state. The bill would also close the Historic Resort Hotel Modernization Fund and would transfer that fund’s balance to the General Revenue Fund.Â
Title
Ending transfers to the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund, closing the Licensed Racetrack Modernization Fund and the Historic Resort Hotel Modernization Fund, and transferring remaining funds to the General Revenue Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - House - Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 679) (Y: 71 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 678) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Point of order, bill not within Governor's proclamation, not sustained (Roll No. 677) (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 678) (Y: 64 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - House - Point of order, bill not within Governor's proclamation, not sustained (Roll No. 677) (Y: 28 N: 65 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-05-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-05-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-05-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-05-26 | House | Effective July 1, 2016 (Roll No. 679) |
2016-05-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 678) |
2016-05-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-05-26 | House | Point of order, bill not within Governor's proclamation, not sustained (Roll No. 677) |
2016-05-26 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2016-05-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-05-25 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2016-05-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-05-24 | House | On 1st reading, House Calendar |
2016-05-23 | House | By substitute, do pass |
2016-05-19 | House | To House Finance |
2016-05-19 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-05-19 | House | To Finance |
2016-05-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 22A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
29 | 25 | 22b | Amended Code | Citation Text |