WI SJR81 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-01 - Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to: proclaiming January 22nd as “Protect Life Day”.
Title
Proclaiming January 22nd as “Protect Life Day”.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-01 | Senate | Failed to adopt pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization, Ayes 18, Noes 13 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Representative Ballweg added as a cosponsor |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Read and referred to Committee on Senate Organization |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced |