WI SB265 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Failed on April 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to create 29.591 (1) (e) of the statutes; Relating to: hunter education requirements for persons under the age of 18 and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Title
Hunter education requirements for persons under the age of 18 and granting rule-making authority. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senator Pfaff added as a coauthor |
2023-11-07 | Senate | Representative Jacobson added as a cosponsor |
2023-09-22 | Senate | Representative Shankland added as a cosponsor |
2023-08-23 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2023-07-18 | Senate | Representative Madison added as a cosponsor |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Fiscal estimate received |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |