WI SB247 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on January 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-22 - Published 1-22-2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 995.50 (2); and to create 995.50 (2) (bm) and 995.60 of the statutes; Relating to: the use of a surveillance device by an owner of real estate in connection with the sale of the real estate and providing a penalty.
Title
The use of a surveillance device by an owner of real estate in connection with the sale of the real estate and providing a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-12 - House - Assembly: Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Published 1-22-2020 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Report approved by the Governor on 1-21-2020. 2019 Wisconsin Act 72 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Presented to the Governor on 1-17-2020 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Report correctly enrolled |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Received from Assembly concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a third time and concurred in |
2020-01-15 | House | Rules suspended |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Read a second time |
2020-01-13 | House | Placed on calendar 1-15-2020 by Committee on Rules |
2020-01-13 | House | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules |
2019-11-12 | House | Refused to suspend rules to withdraw from Senate message and take up, Ayes 60, Noes 35 |
2019-11-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a third time and passed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Read a second time |
2019-11-01 | Senate | Placed on calendar 11-5-2019 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2019-09-26 | Senate | Representative Wittke added as a cosponsor |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Report passage recommended by Committee on Utilities and Housing, Ayes 5, Noes 0 |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Executive action taken |
2019-08-13 | Senate | Public hearing held |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities and Housing |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Introduced |