WI AB540 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-1)
Status: Failed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 635.01; to amend 149.10 (5), 618.36 (1), 625.03 (1m) (d), 625.03 (1m) (e), 631.01 (1) (a) and 645.02 (3); and to create 600.01 (1) (b) 12., 618.02 (4), 618.11 (12m), 618.12 (5), 618.21 (6), 618.26 (5), 618.29, 625.03 (1m) (f), 635.01 (2), 646.01 (1) (a) 2. m. and 646.01 (1) (b) 19. of the statutes; relating to: allowing out-of-state insurers to offer health care plans that are exempt from certain laws to employers and individuals in this state.
Title
Allowing out-of-state insurers to offer health care plans that are exempt from certain laws to employers and individuals in this state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | |
2010-04-26 | Fiscal estimate received | |
2010-04-13 | Withdrawn from committee on Health and Healthcare Reform and referred to committee on Rules pursuant to Assembly Rule 42 (3)(c) | |
2009-10-29 | Read first time and referred to committee on Health and Healthcare Reform | |
2009-10-29 | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2009/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab540 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2009/REG/AB540.pdf |