WI AB489 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to amend 118.33 (1) (a) 1. of the statutes; Relating to: the number of mathematics and science credits required for a high school diploma.
Title
The number of mathematics and science credits required for a high school diploma.
Sponsors
Rep. John Klenke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2013-11-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-12 | House | Made a special order of business at 1:10 PM on 11-14-2013 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 21 |
2013-11-12 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2013-11-12 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 adoption recommended by Committee on Education, Ayes 11, Noes 0 |
2013-11-12 | House | Executive action taken |
2013-11-12 | House | LRB correction (Assembly Substitute Amendment 2) |
2013-11-11 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 2 offered by Representatives Klenke, Kestell and Jagler |
2013-11-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 4 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representatives Klenke, Kestell and Jagler |
2013-11-07 | House | Public hearing held |
2013-11-06 | House | Assembly Amendment 3 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Klenke |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 2 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Klenke |
2013-11-05 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Klenke |
2013-11-04 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Klenke |
2013-11-04 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Education |
2013-11-04 | House | Introduced |
Wisconsin State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/2013/proposals/reg/asm/bill/ab489 |
Text | https://docs.legis.wisconsin.gov/document/proposaltext/2013/REG/AB489.pdf |