WI AB366 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-10)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Published 3-18-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 33-10)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Published 3-18-2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to repeal subchapter IV (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.90]; to amend 20.435 (6) (jm), 50.56 (3), 146.40 (1) (bo), 146.81 (1) (L) and 146.997 (1) (d) 18.; and to create subchapter V (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.60], 50.60, 50.65 and subchapter VI (title) of chapter 50 [precedes 50.90] of the statutes; Relating to: pain clinic certification and requirements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Title
Pain clinic certification and requirements, granting rule-making authority, and providing a penalty. (FE)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Published 3-18-2016 |
2016-03-17 | House | Report approved by the Governor on 3-17-2016. 2015 Wisconsin Act 265 |
2016-03-16 | House | Presented to the Governor on 3-16-2016 |
2016-01-26 | House | Report correctly enrolled on 1-26-2016 |
2016-01-21 | House | Received from Senate concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a third time and concurred in |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Read a second time |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Senator Carpenter added as a cosponsor |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on calendar 1-20-2016 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing requirement waived by committee on Senate Organization, pursuant to Senate Rule 18 (1m), Ayes 3, Noes 2 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Available for scheduling |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Read first time and referred to committee on Senate Organization |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Received from Assembly |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered immediately messaged |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a third time and passed |
2016-01-12 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-01-12 | House | Ordered to a third reading |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adopted |
2016-01-12 | House | Read a second time |
2016-01-07 | House | Assembly Amendment 1 to Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2016-01-07 | House | Placed on calendar 1-12-2016 by Committee on Rules |
2016-01-07 | House | Representative Rohrkaste added as a coauthor |
2015-10-29 | House | Representative Tranel added as a coauthor |
2015-10-23 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2015-10-23 | House | Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-23 | House | Report Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 adoption recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 9, Noes 0 |
2015-10-23 | House | Representative Krug added as a coauthor |
2015-10-22 | House | Executive action taken |
2015-10-21 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-21 | House | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Nygren |
2015-10-14 | House | Public hearing held |
2015-10-14 | House | Representative Murphy added as a coauthor |
2015-10-12 | House | Fiscal estimate received |
2015-10-07 | House | Representative Ballweg added as a coauthor |
2015-09-25 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health |
2015-09-25 | House | Introduced |