WI AB324 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Failed on March 15 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-15 - Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to renumber and amend 103.68 (2); to amend 103.24 and 103.66 (2); and to create 103.68 (2) (bm) of the statutes; Relating to: the employment of minors.
Title
The employment of minors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | House | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 |
2022-01-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-18 | House | Placed on calendar 1-20-2022 by Committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Referred to committee on Rules |
2022-01-18 | House | Report passage recommended by Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment, Ayes 6, Noes 3 |
2021-12-08 | House | Executive action taken |
2021-11-03 | House | Representative Bowen withdrawn as a coauthor |
2021-09-29 | House | Public hearing held |
2021-05-13 | House | Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor and Integrated Employment |
2021-05-13 | House | Introduced |