WA SJM8008 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 6 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Title
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State. |
2018-03-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-03-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-03-01 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-02-22 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-02-22 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | AWTE - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. |
Same As/Similar To
HJM4012 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.