WA HJM4012 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Title
Requesting Congress to reform the harbor maintenance tax.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Dent [R] | Rep. Mary Dye [R] | Rep. Jeff Morris [D] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] | Sen. John Lovick [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] |
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] | Rep. Jim Walsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading, referred to Economic Development & International Trade. |
2018-02-14 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2018-02-14 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-14 | House | Floor amendment |
2018-02-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-25 | House | TED - Majority; do pass. |
2018-01-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Technology & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-04 | House | First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development |
Same As/Similar To
SJM8008 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-06 - Filed with Secretary of State.