WA SCR8401 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on January 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-01-27 - Filed with Secretary of State.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Calling a joint session to honor deceased former members.
Title
Calling a joint session to honor deceased former members.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-27 | Filed with Secretary of State. | |
2009-01-27 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-01-21 | President signed. | |
2009-01-16 | Third reading, adopted. | |
2009-01-16 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-01-16 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. | |
2009-01-14 | Third reading, adopted. | |
2009-01-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-01-14 | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |