WA SB6571 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning license fees for nursing homes, boarding homes, and adult family homes.
Title
Concerning license fees for nursing homes, boarding homes, and adult family homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-03 | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:00 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2954 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=6571&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6571.pdf |