WA HB2954 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-12 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning license fees for nursing homes, boarding homes, and adult family homes.
Title
Concerning license fees for nursing homes, boarding homes, and adult family homes.
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Rules. | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-18 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-18 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-18 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-17 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-03-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:30 PM. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-16 | Vote on third reading will be reconsidered. | |
2010-03-16 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 55; nays, 38; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2010-03-15 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on third reading. | |
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-03-11 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-03-11 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2010-03-11 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-03-11 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2010-03-08 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. | |
2010-03-01 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2010-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 53; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2010-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-26 | Floor amendment | |
2010-02-26 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2010-02-17 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-02-09 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-05 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2010-02-05 | APPH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-05 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-04 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health & Human Services Appropriations at 8:00 AM. | |
2010-01-19 | First reading, referred to Health & Human Services Appropriations. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6571 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.