WA SB6555 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Effective date 6/10/2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing state route number 908 from the state highway system.
Title
Removing state route number 908 from the state highway system.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Haugen [D] | Sen. Rodney Tom [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Effective date 6/10/2010. | |
2010-03-17 | Chapter 81, 2010 Laws. | |
2010-03-17 | Governor signed. | |
2010-03-06 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2010-03-05 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-03-04 | President signed. | |
2010-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2010-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-03-02 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2010-03-01 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-02-26 | TR - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-02-26 | TR - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2010-02-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-02-13 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2010-02-12 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2010-02-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2010-01-28 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2010-01-28 | TRAN - Majority; do pass. | |
2010-01-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. | |
2010-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2010-01-18 | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2918 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.