WA SB6163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning unlawful possession of firearms for persons free on bond or personal recognizance pending trial, appeal, or sentencing for felony charges under RCW 46.61.502(6) and 46.61.504(6).
Title
Concerning unlawful possession of firearms for persons free on bond or personal recognizance pending trial, appeal, or sentencing for felony charges under RCW 46.61.502(6) and 46.61.504(6).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=6163&Year=2019&Initiative=false |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2019-20/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/6163.pdf |