WA SB6161 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Including certain residents who do not have a high school diploma or credential and the number of students expected to enroll in basic education for adults courses at community and technical colleges in caseload forecast council forecasting.
Title
Including certain residents who do not have a high school diploma or credential and the number of students expected to enroll in basic education for adults courses at community and technical colleges in caseload forecast council forecasting.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Sen. David Frockt [D] | Sen. Steven Conway [D] | Sen. Rosemary McAuliffe [D] |
Sen. Robert Hasegawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | HIE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Higher Education at 1:30 PM. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Higher Education. |
2015-12-30 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2329 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.