WA HB2329 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Including certain residents who do not have a high school diploma or credential and the number of students expected to enroll in basic education for adults courses at community and technical colleges in caseload forecast council forecasting.
Title
Including certain residents who do not have a high school diploma or credential and the number of students expected to enroll in basic education for adults courses at community and technical colleges in caseload forecast council forecasting.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Rep. Chris Reykdal [D] | Sen. Hans Zeiger [R] | Rep. Eric Pettigrew [D] |
Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Joan Mcbride [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2016-01-22 | House | HE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-01-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Higher Education at 10:00 AM. |
2016-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Higher Education at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Higher Education |
2015-12-31 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB6161 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.