WA SB6038 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Vetoed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning acupuncture and Eastern medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning acupuncture and Eastern medicine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateGovernor vetoed.
2020-03-10SenateDelivered to Governor.
2020-03-05HouseSpeaker signed.
2020-03-04SenatePresident signed.
2020-03-03HouseThird reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
2020-03-03HouseRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-02-26HouseRules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
2020-02-25HouseReferred to Rules 2 Review.
2020-02-21HouseHCW - Majority; do pass.
2020-02-21HouseExecutive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:30 AM.
2020-02-20HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
2020-02-06HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2020-02-05SenateThird reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
2020-02-05SenateRules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
2020-01-28SenatePlaced on second reading consent calendar.
2020-01-21SenatePassed to Rules Committee for second reading.
2020-01-20SenateHLTC - Majority; do pass.
2020-01-20SenateExecutive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-17SenateExecutive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 8:00 AM.
2020-01-15SenatePublic hearing in the Senate Committee on Health & Long Term Care at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading, referred to Health & Long Term Care.
2019-12-04SenatePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB2203 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-15 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback