WA HB2203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-15 - Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning acupuncture and Eastern medicine.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerning acupuncture and Eastern medicine.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-15HousePublic hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
2019-12-04HousePrefiled for introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB6038 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-25 - Governor vetoed.

Washington State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback