CO HB1002 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 55-4)
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the enactment of the "Social Work Licensure Compact", and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Social Work Licensure Compact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-19 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.002 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1002 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 24-1002, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2024-04-16 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Finance |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2024-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-01 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2024-03-01 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-02-08 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-01-30 | House | House Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-01-10 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health & Human Services |